Bolano Del Vecchio, Silvana Margarita (CPSO#: 84379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Rosemount Avenue Suite 401
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R8
Phone: (613) 728-0088
Fax: (613) 728-8787
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvana Bolano Del Vecchio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bolano Del Vecchio ( CPSO# 84379 )

Business Address:
11 Rosemount Avenue
Suite 401
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R8
Phone Number: (613) 728-0088

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVANA MARGARITA BOLANO DEL VECCHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLANO DEL VECCHIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010