Boldt, Ashlee Elizabeth (CPSO#: 104696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
430 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone: (705) 222-7342
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashlee Boldt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boldt ( CPSO# 104696)

Business Address:
102 - 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 222-7342

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEE ELIZABETH BOLDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017