Bolduc, Norma Christine (CPSO#: 92794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705 759 1234
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norma Bolduc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bolduc ( CPSO# 92794 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-3355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMA CHRISTINE BOLDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLDUC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2015