Boles, Dina Gaber Sos (CPSO#: 98427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Dept of Laboratory Medicine
and Pathobiology
1 King's Circle 6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1A8
Phone: (416) 978-2557
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA GABER SOS BOLES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOLES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BOLES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOLES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOLES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOLES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOLES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018