Boles, Murray (CPSO#: 14512)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 29 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011