Bolland, Mary Frances (CPSO#: 71159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Clarkson Road North
Mississauga ON  L5J 2W4
Phone: (905) 822-9171
Fax: (905) 823-3990
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Frances Bolland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bolland ( CPSO# 71159 )

Business Address:
1265 Clarkson Road North
Mississauga ON  L5J 2W4
Phone Number: (905) 822-9171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY FRANCES BOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999