Bolli, Peter (CPSO#: 71976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 1997

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Oct 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Zurich, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Instructions: Patients requiring copies of their medical records can contact Records Management Ltd. as per above.
Date Received: 06 Apr 2018


Address: Records Management Ltd. 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2000
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Aug 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Peter Bolli may practise medicine in the ambulatory internal medicine
                  teaching  clinic  located  in  St. Catharines, Ontario that is associated
                  with the Department of Medicine at McMaster University.

            2.    The certificate of registration  will automatically expire when Dr. Bolli
                  no longer holds the faculty appointment at McMaster University.

            Note: This certificate currently has an expiry date of June 30, 2020, to accord
                  with the end date of Dr. Bolli's appointment at McMaster University.  The
                  expiry  date  may  be  extended contingent  on  renewal  of  Dr.  Bolli's
                  appointment at McMaster University.