Bollinger, Megan Loren (CPSO#: 97755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Authority c/o Primary Health Care
PO Box 1300
61 Queen Street Main Floor
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: 807-737-3030
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Bollinger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bollinger ( CPSO# 97755 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care
61 Queen Street Main Floor
Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN LOREN BOLLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLLINGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014