Bologna, John Tony (CPSO#: 50180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Bologna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012