Bolton, Craig James (CPSO#: 88384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: 613-969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bolton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bolton ( CPSO# 88384 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG JAMES BOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010