Bolton, Gregg Maynard (CPSO#: 90951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General and Marine Hosp
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 444-8606
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

186 Erie St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1P6
Canada
Phone: 705-445-9711
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

55 Isla St
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Canada
Phone: 5199863040
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregg Bolton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bolton ( CPSO# 90951 )

Business Address:
Suite 100A
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-9711

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 444-8606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGG MAYNARD BOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011