Bolton, James Edward (CPSO#: 52688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Drive
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 2H4
Phone: (705) 549-9470 Ext. 2814
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James E. Bolton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bolton ( CPSO# 52688 )

Business Address:
Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Drive
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 2H4

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD BOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2002