Bon, Trevor James (CPSO#: 68020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Care Group
P O Box 3251
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 346-6796
Fax: (807) 346-9015
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor J. Bon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bon ( CPSO# 68020 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Care Group
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 346-6796

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR JAMES BON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998