Bonacci, Giuseppe (CPSO#: 88386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville Queens University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 102
145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910 Ext. 8
Fax: (613) 771-1833
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonacci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lynch ( CPSO# 88688 )
Dr. G. Bonacci ( CPSO# 88386 )

Business Address:
Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
102 - 145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone Number: (613) 771-1910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE BONACCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONACCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010