Bonafede, Nicoletta (CPSO#: 65450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
8760 Jane Street
Concord ON  L4K 2M9
Phone: (905) 597-3724
Fax: (905) 597-3726
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicoletta Bonafede Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 60768 )
Dr. N. Bonafede ( CPSO# 65450 )

Business Address:
8760 Jane Street
Suite 201
Vaughan ON  L4K 2M9
Phone Number: (905) 597-3724

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLETTA BONAFEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONAFEDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993