Bonajmah, Abdullah Ali Abdullah Ali (CPSO#: 73072)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 21 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 1999 to 21 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2000 to 21 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2001 to 21 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004