Bonaparte, James Patrick (CPSO#: 86476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 308
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 521-3223
Fax: (613) 521-6017
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place District Hospital
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

The Sound Room
1800 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0W3
Canada
Phone: (613) 627-4700
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James P. Bonaparte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bonaparte ( CPSO# 86476 )

Business Address:
Unit 308
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 883-6673

Business Address:
The Soundroom
1800 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0W3
Phone Number: (613) 627-4660

Business Address:
Carleton Place District Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK BONAPARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONAPARTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012