Bondar, Roberta Lynn (CPSO#: 30010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
530 Balliol Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1E3
Phone: (416) 481-5847
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Mexico

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA LYNN BONDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978