Bondaz, Louis (CPSO#: 102869)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Malvern Medical Center 1333 Neilson Road Toronto, ON M1B 4Y9
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2015