Bongard, Howard Bryan (CPSO#: 24891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
Building A
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 439-6654
Fax: (416) 439-6655
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Bongard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bongard ( CPSO# 24891 )

Business Address:
104 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 439-6654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 18, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Howard Bryan Bongard, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bongard has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. HOWARD BONGARD
                                            ("Dr. Bongard")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bongard, certificate of registration number 24891, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 105756 (the "Investigation") into my standard of
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Bongard, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bongard, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in professionalism and
                              communication, with an instructor selected by the College and
                  
                        (ii)  review and written summary of CPSO Policies on Physician
                              Behavior in the Professional Environment and as set out in
                              Appendix A.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bongard, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Bongard, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (11)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bongard, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (11)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted Dr. Bongard's standard
                              of practice. As a result of the investigation:

                              *     Dr. Bongard will engage in professional education in
                                    professionalism and communication.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Bongard, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Bongard, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Howard Bryan Bongard to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 18, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted Dr. Bongard’s standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Bongard will engage in professional education in professionalism and communication.