Bonifacio, Herbert Joseph (CPSO#: 91793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8859
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: 416-867-3736
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERBERT JOSEPH BONIFACIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIFACIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009