Bonin, Denis Maurice (CPSO#: 58373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 4779
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181


Corporation Name: Dr. Denis Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 108555)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 27 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIS MAURICE BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989