Bonin, Michel Lloyd (CPSO#: 58383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4779
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Blind river District Health Center
525 Causley St.
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Canada
Phone: 705 356-2265
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Rd.
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: 705 647-8121
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420 Ext. 3059
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Manitoulin Health Center
Box 640
11 Meredith Street East
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 368-2300
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michel Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-4779

Business Address:
Manitolulin Health Centre
11 Meredith Street East
Box 640
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-5311

Business Address:
Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
Manitoulin Health Centre - Mindemoya Site
2120 Highway 551
Box 170
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5311

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121


Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 27 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL LLOYD BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1989