Bonin, Miguel Marc Joseph (CPSO#: 67981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Miguel Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 67981 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Aug 2016

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Bonin’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Bonin engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making remarks of a sexual nature and engaging in touching and behaviour of a sexual nature, including sexual intercourse (primarily at his office), and inappropriately prescribing narcotics to the patient including in exchange for sexual acts.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 23, 2016, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Miguel Marc Joseph Bonin
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bonin has provided to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Miguel Marc Joseph Bonin is currently not practising medicine in
                  Ontario and has undertaken to provide the College with a minimum of
                  forty-five (45) days' notice if he intends to return to practice.
                  
                  
                  
            As from January 16, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Miguel
            Marc Joseph Bonin:

            Practice Monitoring

            (i)   With the exception of acting as a surgical assistant to a certified
                  surgeon (as detailed below), Dr. Bonin shall not engage in any
                  professional encounter or interaction with any female person except in
                  the presence of a monitor;

            (ii)  That monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the
                  terms of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as
                  amended, who is acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons (the
                  "College");

            (iii) the Monitor must remain in the examination or consulting room at all
                  times during all professional encounters with all female patients;

            (iv)  the Monitor is required to carefully observe all physical examinations of
                  all  female patients, including but not limited to internal examinations
                  of female patients;

            (v)   the Monitor is required to maintain a log of all female patient
                  encounters and that the log shall provide the name of the female patient,
                  and the purpose and date of the appointment. The Monitor will sign and
                  date the corresponding entry on the female patient's medical record;

            (vi)  Dr. Bonin shall post a sign in his office and consulting rooms notifying
                  patients of subparagraphs (i) and (ii) above;  

            (vii) If Dr. Bonin acts as a surgical assistant to a certified surgeon who is
                  operating upon a female patient, he must be in the presence of a
                  Regulated Health Professional throughout the entirety of the encounter
                  with the female patient.

            (viii)Dr. Bonin shall keep the College updated with respect to all locations
                  where he acts as a surgical assistant. All Chief of Staff (s) and
                  surgeon(s) whom he assists shall sign a notice advising that they are
                  aware of this order and specifically clause (vii).   

            (ix)  Dr. Bonin shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any
                  person or institution who may have relevant information, for the purposes
                  of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order;
                  and

            (x)   Dr. Bonin shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his office(s) and practice(s) and patient charts by a
                  College representative for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his
                  compliance with the terms of this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jan 2012
Summary:

On January 16, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Miguel Marc Joseph Bonin 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Patient A was referred to Dr. Bonin for prenatal and maternity care. During an appointment in 
2007, in the presence of Patient A's common law partner, Patient A reports that Dr. Bonin stated 
"isn't this like a dream or a fantasy that you're getting felt up with two in the same room."   
 
Patient B was referred to Dr. Bonin for prenatal and maternity in 2007. Patient B reports that Dr. 
Bonin made inappropriate comments during vaginal exams that made her uncomfortable. During 
an exam, Patient B reports that Dr. Bonin said to her a comment like, "you like it dirty, you like it 
rough."  Patient B reports that Dr. Bonin additionally commented to her, "I became this kind of 
doctor so that I could see pretty women in my office."  
 
Patient C was referred to Dr. Bonin for prenatal and maternity care by her family doctor in 2007 
when she was pregnant with her first child. Patient C reports that Dr. Bonin asked her how often 
she has sex with her husband and questioned how many times she climaxes. Patient C reports 
that while being educated on the subject of breastfeeding, Dr. Bonin told her that she was well 
endowed and has a very nice cup size.   
 
Patient D was provided primary care with Dr. Bonin between 2000 and 2009. Patient D reports 
that in 2003, during her first pap smear, when she was approximately twenty two years old, Dr. 
Bonin told her to relax, lay back and think about her boyfriend. In 2009, Patient D was 
uncomfortable and began to bring her boyfriend with her to her prenatal appointments with Dr. 
Bonin. Patient D reports that on one occasion, during a prenatal appointment, when her boyfriend 
was not with her Dr. Bonin inquired where her boyfriend was. Patient D reports that she told Dr. 
Bonin that her boyfriend was out of town and Dr. Bonin said: "oh what time should you be 
expecting me tonight?"   
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Bonin's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence immediately. 
 
2.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bonin's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      Practice Monitoring 
      (i)   With the exception of acting as a surgical assistant to a certified surgeon (as 
            detailed below), Dr. Bonin shall not engage in any professional encounter or 
            interaction with any female person except in the presence of a monitor; 
 
 
 
      (ii)  That monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the terms of the 
            Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18 as amended, who is 
            acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons (the "College"); 
 
      (iii) The Monitor must remain in the examination or consulting room at all times 
            during all professional encounters with all female patients; 
 
      (iv)  The Monitor is required to carefully observe all physical examinations of all  
            female patients, including but not limited to internal examinations of female 
            patients; 
 
      (v)   The Monitor is required to maintain a log of all female patient encounters and that 
            the log shall provide the name of the female patient, and the purpose and date of 
            the appointment. The Monitor will sign and date the corresponding entry on the 
            female patient's medical record; 
 
      (vi)  Dr. Bonin shall post a sign in his office and consulting rooms notifying patients of 
            subparagraphs (i) and (ii) above;    
 
      (vii) If Dr. Bonin acts as a surgical assistant to a certified surgeon who is operating 
            upon a female patient, he must be in the presence of a Regulated Health 
            Professional throughout the entirety of the encounter with the female patient. 
 
      (viii) Dr. Bonin shall keep the College updated with respect to all locations where he 
            acts as a surgical assistant. All Chief of Staff (s) and surgeon(s) whom he assists 
            shall sign a notice advising that they are aware of this order and specifically clause 
            (vii).    
 
      (ix)  Dr. Bonin shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate 
            enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution 
            who may have relevant information, for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing 
            his compliance with the terms of this Order; and 
 
      (x)   Dr. Bonin shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his 
            office(s) and practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the 
            purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Bonin appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
4.    Dr. Bonin pay to the College costs in the amount of $7,300.00, within 90 days of the date 
      of this Order.  
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 16, 2012