Boniolo, Hernan (CPSO#: 83542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone: (519) 369-2510
Fax: (519) 369-3831
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boniolo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boniolo ( CPSO# 83542 )

Business Address:
368 College Street North
PO Box 1260
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERNAN BONIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Oct 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009