Bonn, Gary Elliott (CPSO#: 27904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Amiens, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-1335 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8N8
Phone: (613) 729-8600
Fax: (613) 729-2546
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Bonn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bonn ( CPSO# 27904 )

Business Address:
105 - 1335 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8N8
Phone Number: (613) 729-8600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 31 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY ELLIOTT BONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1975