Bonnar, Paul Eldon (CPSO#: 101862)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2016 to 08 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017