Bonneau, Daniel (CPSO#: 44820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 8 003 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5706
Fax: (416) 864-5031
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Bonneau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Karry ( CPSO# 55339 )
Dr. D. Bonneau ( CPSO# 44820 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 8 003 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5706

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL BONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1994