Bonnett, Jennifer Eileen (CPSO#: 69085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
600 Princess Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 4H4
Phone: (519) 421-7252
Fax: (519) 421-9924
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Bonnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bonnett ( CPSO# 69085 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
600 Princess Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 421-7252

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER EILEEN BONNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997