Bonney, Stephen Thomas (CPSO#: 29213)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 288 Cedar Crescent, Cambridge, ON N1S 1X1
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015