Bonsor, Claire Naomi (CPSO#: 65606)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996