Bood, Timothy William (CPSO#: 32680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1989