Boodhwani, Munir (CPSO#: 76045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Surgery H3405
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7295
Fax: (613) 696-7302
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Munir Boodhwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boodhwani ( CPSO# 76045 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Surgery
H3405 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNIR BOODHWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOODHWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008