Boodoosingh, Lal Andrew (CPSO#: 21549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1988
Summary:

 In November 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Boodoosingh guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with 
 a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Boodoosingh's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Jun 1990
Hearing Date(s): 21 Nov 1988

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lal Andrew Boodoosingh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 23, 2016.

Dr. Boodoosingh was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct with respect to advising the College of a change in his practice location, and was also the subject of an assessment of his practice. As a result, Dr. Boodoosingh will resign from the College on June 1, 2016 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration
as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)