Boone, Andrea Audrey (CPSO#: 80850)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2006 to 25 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2007 to 25 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2009 to 25 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2014