Boone, Sharon Anne (CPSO#: 62067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4070 Bowness Road NW
Calgary AB  T3B 3R7
Phone: 403 297 8123
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharon Boone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boone ( CPSO# 62067 )

Business Address:
7007 116 St NW
Edmonton AB  T6H 5R8
Phone Number: (604) 626-5723

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ANNE BOONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1991