Boorany, Yusuf (CPSO#: 31827)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical Records may be found at RSRS 1-888-563-3732 EXT 1 or www.GetMyRecords.ca
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017


Instructions: Patients can be obtain a copy of their records by contacting RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1 or online at www.GetMyMedRecord.ca.
Date Received: 01 Dec 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017