Booth, Bradley David (CPSO#: 74902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
2nd Floor - Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613-722-6521 Ext. 6120
Fax: 613-798-2992
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Lawrence Valley Correctional &TC
PO Box 8000
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 7N2
Canada
Phone: 613-341-2870
Fax: 613-341-2882
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Booth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Booth ( CPSO# 74902 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor Forensics
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2006