Booth, Gillian Lynn (CPSO#: 66614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
6th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3719
Fax: (416) 867-3724
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN LYNN BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997