Booth, Michael Douglas (CPSO#: 29006)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: North Wellington Health Care Corporation Louise Marshall Hospital Site 630 Dublin Street Mount Forest Ontario N0G 2L3
Date Received: 24 Oct 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012