Booy, Jason Dirk (CPSO#: 98293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102, Liberty Market Building
171 East Liberty St
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Men/Trans Clinic
66 Gerrard St E - 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Booy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Booy ( CPSO# 98293 )

Business Address:
Village Family Health Team
Liberty Market Building
102 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (647) 302-2530

Business Address:
66 Gerrard Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 922-0566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON DIRK BOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015