Boparai, Shabab (CPSO#: 79507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie-Curie Private
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boparai ( CPSO# 79507 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABAB BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005