Bor-Shavit, Elite (CPSO#: 105303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2015

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite W3248
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79422
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELITE BOR-SHAVIT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BOR-SHAVIT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BOR-SHAVIT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOR-SHAVIT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOR-SHAVIT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BOR-SHAVIT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BOR-SHAVIT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2015 to 25 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017