Bora, Bishwajit (CPSO#: 66830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Urology Centre
2-1760 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 673-6836
Fax: (705) 673-2304
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BISHWAJIT BORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998