Bordalba, Emilia Mak (CPSO#: 61033)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 2001