Bordeleau, Marie-Josee (CPSO#: 71695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
665 Earl Armstrong
Unit 3
Ottawa ON  K1V 2G2
Phone: (613) 822-0411
Fax: (613) 822-1399
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE BORDELEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDELEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2000