Borden, Barry Stephen (CPSO#: 24730)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016