Borden, Susan Maria (CPSO#: 95126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Borden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Borden ( CPSO# 95126 )

Business Address:
1221 Lakeshore Road
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIA BORDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 20 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014