Bordman, Joel Stephen (CPSO#: 55786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3250 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H6
Phone: (416) 261-2111
Fax: (416) 261-7771
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Extendicare Bayview LTC
550 Cummer St East
Toronto ON  M2K 2M2
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-1331
Fax: (416) 226-2745
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trilogy Long Term Care
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Canada
Phone: (416) 443-1074
Fax: (416) 386-0464
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

First Step Toronto
1896 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 2J6
Canada
Phone: (647) 344-8881
Fax: (647) 347-6888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Bordman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bordman ( CPSO# 55786 )
Dr. R. Bordman ( CPSO# 58143 )
Dr. Z. Bordman ( CPSO# 106507)

Business Address:
1896 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 2J6
Phone Number: (647) 344-8881

Business Address:
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 443-1074

Business Address:
550 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 226-1331

Business Address:
3250 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H6
Phone Number: (416) 261-2111

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL STEPHEN BORDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007