Bordman, Risa Barbara (CPSO#: 58143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Goldenmile Medical Centre
Unit 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Bordman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bordman ( CPSO# 55786 )
Dr. R. Bordman ( CPSO# 58143 )
Dr. Z. Bordman ( CPSO# 106507)

Business Address:
3250 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H6
Phone Number: (416) 261-2111

Business Address:
550 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 226-1331

Business Address:
1896 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 2J6
Phone Number: (647) 344-8881

Business Address:
340 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 443-1074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RISA BARBARA BORDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988